LA SCR88 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes Congress to adopt the Constitution Restoration Act.
Title
Memorializes Congress to adopt the Constitution Restoration Act.
Sponsors
Sen. A.G. Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - House - House Vote on SCR 88 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#897) (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 88 ADOPT (#783) (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 88 ADOPT (#783) (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013. |
2013-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2013-06-05 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 90 yeas, 1 nays. |
2013-06-04 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/5/2013. |
2013-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/4/2013. |
2013-06-03 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2013-06-02 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 29 yeas and 2 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |