LA SCR87 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes Congress to call a convention to propose an amendment to the U.S. Constitution that will restore elections strong in individual participation and engagement.
Title
Memorializes Congress to call a convention to propose an amendment to the U.S. Constitution that will restore elections strong in individual participation and engagement.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Carter [D] | Sen. Wesley Bishop [D] | Sen. Jean-Paul Morrell [D] | Sen. Karen Peterson [D] |
Sen. Rick Ward [R] | Sen. Patrick Cortez [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 87 ADOPT (#889) (Y: 10 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Senate | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 10 yeas and 21 nays. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |