LA SCR86 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends LSU Baseball Coach Paul Mainieri on the occasion of his retirement.
Title
Commends LSU Baseball Coach Paul Mainieri on the occasion of his retirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 86 ADOPT (#966) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021. |
2021-06-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2021-06-09 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2021-06-08 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2021-06-08 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |