LA SCR86 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education, the division of administration and the Department of Education to study the feasibility of direct state appropriation to retirement systems the constitutionally-required annual payments owed on behalf of teachers and other public school employees.
Title
Requests the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education, the division of administration and the Department of Education to study the feasibility of direct state appropriation to retirement systems the constitutionally-required annual payments owed on behalf of teachers and other public school employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 86, ADOPT (#685) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-05-24 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-05-24 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-05-20 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2010-05-19 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2010-05-19 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |