LA SCR85 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Alton Ralph "Red" Sims on his many years of public service.
Title
Commends Alton Ralph "Red" Sims on his many years of public service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 85 ADOPT (#260) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2017-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2017-05-10 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2017-05-10 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |