LA SCR8 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Dept. of Education to investigate the feasibility and cost of installing silent alarms in all elementary and secondary school classrooms.
Title
Requests the Dept. of Education to investigate the feasibility and cost of installing silent alarms in all elementary and secondary school classrooms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on SCR 8 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1248) (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 8 ADOPT (#250) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 8 ADOPT (#250) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018. |
2018-05-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2018-05-17 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 79 yeas, 0 nays. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18. |
2018-05-09 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-08 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2018-04-05 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-04-04 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |