LA SCR78 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the legislative intent regarding Act 379 of the Regular Session of 2014.
Title
Provides relative to the legislative intent regarding Act 379 of the Regular Session of 2014.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |