LA SCR75 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Board of Regents to study the feasibility of establishing a law school in the Shreveport-Bossier area.
Title
Requests the Board of Regents to study the feasibility of establishing a law school in the Shreveport-Bossier area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SCR 75 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#687) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 75 ADOPT (#179) (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 75 ADOPT (#179) (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/30/2019. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-05-30 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 97 yeas, 0 nays. |
2019-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19. |
2019-05-16 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). |
2019-05-01 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2019-04-30 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 6 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |