LA SCR73 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses sincere and heartfelt condolences to the family and friends of Frank Paul Simoneaux on the occasion of his passing.
Title
Expresses sincere and heartfelt condolences to the family and friends of Frank Paul Simoneaux on the occasion of his passing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 73 ADOPT (#1079) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2024-05-22 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2024-05-22 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |