LA SCR72 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Louisiana's pregnancy resource centers, adoption agencies, maternity homes, and pro life citizen leaders, and designates April 20, 2016, as Pro Life Day at the legislature.
Title
Commends Louisiana's pregnancy resource centers, adoption agencies, maternity homes, and pro life citizen leaders, and designates April 20, 2016, as Pro Life Day at the legislature.
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Long [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 72 ADOPT (#337) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2016-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2016-04-20 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2016-04-20 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |