LA SCR72 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes an advisory group to determine the future utilization of the former Greenwell Springs Mental Health Hospital facility.
Title
Establishes an advisory group to determine the future utilization of the former Greenwell Springs Mental Health Hospital facility.
Sponsors
Sen. Dale Erdey [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 72, CONCUR (#1709) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-06-01 - House - House Vote on SCR 72, AMENDMENT # 543 BY BURNS, T., MOTION TO ADOPT (#1439) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 72, ADOPT (#733) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-06-01 - House - House Vote on SCR 72, AMENDMENT # 543 BY BURNS, T., MOTION TO ADOPT (#1439) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 72, ADOPT (#733) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-04 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12. | |
2012-06-04 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-06-04 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-06-03 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 30 yeas and 4 nays. | |
2012-06-01 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2012-06-01 | Read by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 91 yeas, 0 nays. | |
2012-05-31 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2012. | |
2012-05-31 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2012-05-30 | Reported with amendments (10-0). | |
2012-05-22 | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2012-05-21 | Reported favorably (15-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2012-05-08 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2012-05-07 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2012-05-03 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. | |
2012-05-02 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-04-26 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | |
2012-04-25 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |