LA SCR70 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Louisiana Community Health Worker Workforce Study Committee.
Title
Creates the Louisiana Community Health Worker Workforce Study Committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - House - House Vote on SCR 70 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#861) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 70 ADOPT (#331) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 70 ADOPT (#331) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019. |
2019-06-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2019-06-03 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 98 yeas, 0 nays. |
2019-05-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/19. |
2019-05-30 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-29 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-05-16 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-05-15 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |