LA SCR7 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To urge and request certain officials and local governments to dismiss coastal lawsuits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To urge and request certain officials and local governments to dismiss coastal lawsuits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SCR 7 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#627) (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 7 ADOPT (#259) (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-01SenateSent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
2020-06-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-31SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-31SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2020-05-29HouseRead by title, concurred in by vote of 61 yeas, 33 nays.
2020-05-28HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20.
2020-05-28HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-27HouseReported favorably (10-3).
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2020-05-20HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2020-05-20SenateRead by title and adopted by a vote of 21 yeas and 15 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2020-05-20SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2020-05-18SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2020-05-14SenateRead by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 3 for 05/18.
2020-05-14SenateRules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
2020-05-12SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2020-05-11SenateReported favorably.
2020-03-10SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
2020-03-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback