LA SCR7 | 2016 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 88-54-2)
Status: Passed on June 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-21 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 88-54-2)
Status: Passed on June 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-21 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses sincere condolences upon the passing of Elward J.Stephens of St. Martin Parish.
Title
Expresses sincere condolences upon the passing of Elward J.Stephens of St. Martin Parish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 7 ADOPT (#41) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2016-06-20 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-06-20 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-06-19 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2016-06-17 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2016-06-17 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |