LA SCR7 | 2016 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-08 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-08 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes Congress to maintain the Outer Continental Shelf revenue sharing arrangement passed under the Gulf of Mexico Energy Security Act of 2006.
Title
Memorializes Congress to maintain the Outer Continental Shelf revenue sharing arrangement passed under the Gulf of Mexico Energy Security Act of 2006.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 7 ADOPT (#42) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 7 CO-AUTHORS (#41) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 7 CO-AUTHORS (#41) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2016-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2016-03-02 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2016-03-02 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2016-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |