LA SCR7 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Kinder High School Yellow Jackets on winning the Class 2A state football championship.
Title
Commends the Kinder High School Yellow Jackets on winning the Class 2A state football championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 7 ADOPT (#7) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2014-03-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2014-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2014-03-12 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |