LA SCR7 | 2011 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 04/14.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 04/14.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Sheila W. Seals on being named School Social Worker of the Year.
Title
Commends Sheila W. Seals on being named School Social Worker of the Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 7, ADOPT (#49) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 04/14. | |
2011-04-04 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-04-04 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-03-30 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2011-03-29 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2011-03-29 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2011-03-29 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |