LA SCR68 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/2/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Commends Ronald James Gomez Sr. upon being inducted into the Louisiana Political Museum and Hall of Fame.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commends Ronald James Gomez Sr. upon being inducted into the Louisiana Political Museum and Hall of Fame.

Sponsors

Sen. Gerald Long [R]Sen. Neil Riser [R]Sen. Michael Walsworth [R]Rep. Mark Abraham [R]
Rep. Neil Abramson [D]Rep. Daryl Adams [I]Rep. Beryl Amedee [R]Rep. John Anders [D]
Rep. James Armes [D]Rep. Tony Bacala [R]Rep. Lawrence Bagley [R]Rep. John Bagneris [D]
Rep. Taylor Barras [R]Rep. John Berthelot [R]Rep. Robert Billiot [D]Rep. Stuart Bishop [R]
Rep. Joseph Bouie [D]Rep. Ryan Bourriaque [R]Rep. Ken Brass [D]Rep. Chad Brown [D]
Rep. Terry Brown [I]Rep. Thomas Carmody [R]Rep. Barbara Carpenter [D]Rep. Gary Carter [D]
Rep. Robert Carter [D]Rep. Stephen Carter [R]Rep. Charles Chaney [R]Rep. Patrick Connick [R]
Rep. Jean-paul Coussan [R]Rep. Kenny Cox [D]Rep. Raymond Crews [R]Rep. Paula Davis [R]
Rep. Phillip DeVillier [R]Rep. Mary DuBuisson [R]Rep. Royce Duplessis [D]Rep. Stephen Dwight [R]
Rep. Rick Edmonds [R]Rep. Julie Emerson [R]Rep. Reid Falconer [R]Rep. Franklin Foil [R]
Rep. A.B. Franklin [D]Rep. Randal Gaines [D]Rep. Raymond Garofalo [R]Rep. Jerry Gisclair [D]
Rep. Cedric Glover [D]Rep. John Guinn [R]Rep. Jimmy Harris [D]Rep. Lance Harris [R]
Rep. Cameron Henry [R]Rep. Stephanie Hilferty [R]Rep. Dorothy Hill [D]Rep. Valarie Hodges [R]
Rep. Frank Hoffmann [R]Rep. Paul Hollis [R]Rep. Dodie Horton [R]Rep. Frank Howard [R]
Rep. Mike Huval [R]Rep. Barry Ivey [R]Rep. Katrina Jackson [D]Rep. Edward James [D]
Rep. Patrick Jefferson [D]Rep. Samuel Jenkins [D]Rep. Mike Johnson [R]Rep. Robert Johnson [D]
Rep. Sam Jones [D]Rep. Edmond Jordan [D]Rep. Jeremy LaCombe [D]Rep. Nancy Landry [R]
Rep. Terry Landry [D]Rep. Ed Larvadain [D]Rep. Bernard LeBas [D]Rep. Walt Leger [D]
Rep. Christopher Leopold [R]Rep. Rodney Lyons [D]Rep. Sherman Mack [R]Rep. Tanner Magee [R]
Rep. Denise Marcelle [D]Rep. Joseph Marino [I]Rep. Jack McFarland [R]Rep. Wayne McMahen [R]
Rep. Blake Miguez [R]Rep. Dustin Miller [D]Rep. Gregory Miller [R]Rep. Pat Moore [D]
Rep. John Morris [R]Rep. James Morris [R]Rep. Stuart Moss [R]Rep. Nicholas Muscarello [R]
Rep. Barbara Norton [D]Rep. Kevin Pearson [R]Rep. Vincent Pierre [D]Rep. Rogers Pope [R]
Rep. Stephen Pugh [R]Rep. Steve Pylant [R]Rep. Jerome Richard [I]Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R]
Rep. Alan Seabaugh [R]Rep. Scott Simon [R]Rep. Patricia Smith [D]Rep. Joseph Stagni [D]
Rep. John Stefanski [R]Rep. Julie Stokes [R]Rep. Kirk Talbot [R]Rep. Polly Thomas [R]
Rep. Christopher Turner [R]Rep. Malinda White [D]Rep. Mark Wright [R]Rep. Jerome Zeringue [R]

Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 68 ADOPT (#174) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateSent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/2/2019.
2019-05-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2019-05-02SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2019-05-01SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2019-05-01HouseRead by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
2019-04-30HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-04-30SenateRead by title and adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2019-04-29SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback