LA SCR67 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests that local governmental subdivisions consider manufactured home chassis elevation when setting requirements for freeboard purposes.
Title
Requests that local governmental subdivisions consider manufactured home chassis elevation when setting requirements for freeboard purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 67 CONCUR (#694) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SCR 67 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#623) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 67 ADOPT (#255) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SCR 67 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#623) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 67 ADOPT (#255) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020. |
2020-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2020-05-29 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 100 yeas, 0 nays. |
2020-05-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20. |
2020-05-27 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-26 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2020-05-21 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2020-05-20 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |