LA SCR67 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Department of Health and Hospitals to study possible methods which would increase the provision of graduate medical education in central Louisiana by designating certain hospitals which enter into public/private partnerships with Huey P. Long Medical Center as major teaching hospitals for purposes of Medicaid reimbursement.
Title
Requests the Department of Health and Hospitals to study possible methods which would increase the provision of graduate medical education in central Louisiana by designating certain hospitals which enter into public/private partnerships with Huey P. Long Medical Center as major teaching hospitals for purposes of Medicaid reimbursement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 67, ADOPT (#401) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/10. | |
2011-06-09 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-09 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-08 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2011-06-08 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2011-06-08 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2011-06-07 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |