LA SCR63 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-8)
Status: Passed on May 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requests the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education to create a task force to develop and oversee continuous learning outside of normal practices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests the State Board of Elementary and Secondary Education to create a task force to develop and oversee continuous learning outside of normal practices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SCR 63 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#631) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 63 CO-AUTHORS (#315) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 63 ADOPT (#314) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-01SenateSent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
2020-06-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-05-31SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-05-31SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2020-05-29HouseRead by title, concurred in by vote of 95 yeas, 0 nays.
2020-05-28HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20.
2020-05-28HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-27HouseReported favorably (10-0).
2020-05-26HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-05-26HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2020-05-22SenateSenate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
2020-05-21SenateReported with amendments.
2020-05-15SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
2020-05-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback