LA SCR61 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
. Re-establishes the Lower Pearl River Basin Task Force.
Title
. Re-establishes the Lower Pearl River Basin Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - House - House Vote on SCR 61 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1163) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 61 ADOPT (#679) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 61 ADOPT (#679) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-08 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2023. |
2023-06-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2023-06-07 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 98 yeas, 0 nays. |
2023-06-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2023. |
2023-06-04 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2023-06-04 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |