LA SCR61 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the St. Amant High School softball team on winning the 5A state championship.
Title
Commends the St. Amant High School softball team on winning the 5A state championship.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Lambert [R] | Sen. Edward Price [D] | Rep. Tony Bacala [R] | Rep. Ken Brass [D] |
Rep. Kathy Edmonston [R] | Rep. Clay Schexnayder [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 61 ADOPT (#728) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2022-05-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-05-24 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2022-05-23 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2022-05-23 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |