LA SCR61 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-10)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expresses condolences upon the deaths of former state representative Victor "Vic" Stelly and his wife, Terry Bass Stelly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expresses condolences upon the deaths of former state representative Victor "Vic" Stelly and his wife, Terry Bass Stelly.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 61 CO-AUTHORS (#415) (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 61 ADOPT (#414) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01SenateSent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021.
2021-05-26HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2021-05-25SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2021-05-24SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2021-05-24HouseRead by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
2021-05-20HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.
2021-05-20HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2021-05-20SenateRead by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2021-05-19SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback