LA SCR61 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-4)
Status: Passed on May 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-4)
Status: Passed on May 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes May 2020 as Louisiana Abortion Recovery Awareness Month and commends pro-life groups for their service to women suffering from abortion related trauma.
Title
Recognizes May 2020 as Louisiana Abortion Recovery Awareness Month and commends pro-life groups for their service to women suffering from abortion related trauma.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 61 CONCUR (#693) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SCR 61 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#620) (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 61 ADOPT (#131) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SCR 61 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#620) (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 61 ADOPT (#131) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020. |
2020-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. |
2020-05-31 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2020-05-29 | House | Read by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 84 yeas, 8 nays. |
2020-05-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20. |
2020-05-21 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2020-05-20 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). |
2020-05-13 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2020-05-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |