LA SCR61 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/12/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/12/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Elijah Mitchell on his outstanding football career at Erath High School and wishes him the best with his upcoming college career with the Ragin' Cajuns.
Title
Commends Elijah Mitchell on his outstanding football career at Erath High School and wishes him the best with his upcoming college career with the Ragin' Cajuns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 61 ADOPT (#175) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/12/2017. |
2017-05-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2017-05-02 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2017-05-02 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |