LA SCR61 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-13 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Board of Regents to conduct a study of two-year college services offered in northeast Louisiana and determine how best to meet both the educational needs of students and workforce development needs of business and industry in the region.
Title
Requests the Board of Regents to conduct a study of two-year college services offered in northeast Louisiana and determine how best to meet both the educational needs of students and workforce development needs of business and industry in the region.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 61, ADOPT (#398) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/10. | |
2011-06-09 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-09 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-08 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2011-06-08 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2011-06-07 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2011-06-07 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |
2011-06-07 | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. | |
2011-06-06 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |