LA SCR6 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/27/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/27/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses legislative intent for enforcement of laws regulating fishing gear authorized for use in Louisiana's offshore waters.
Title
Expresses legislative intent for enforcement of laws regulating fishing gear authorized for use in Louisiana's offshore waters.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Claitor [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-19 - House - House Vote on SCR 6 RECORD VOTE (#918) (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 6 ADOPT (#343) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 6 ADOPT (#343) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-30 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/27/2016. |
2016-05-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2016-05-19 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 76 yeas, 0 nays. |
2016-05-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2016. |
2016-05-12 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-11 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2016-04-21 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2016-04-20 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |