LA SCR6 | 2011 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 04/14.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 04/14.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Betty J. Cunningham upon retirement as secretary-treasurer of the Beauregard Parish Police Jury.
Title
Commends Betty J. Cunningham upon retirement as secretary-treasurer of the Beauregard Parish Police Jury.
Sponsors
Rep. James Armes [D] | Rep. Michael Danahay [D] | Rep. Brett Geymann [R] | Rep. Dorothy Hill [D] |
Sen. John Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 6, ADOPT (#42) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 04/14. | |
2011-03-31 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-03-30 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-03-29 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2011-03-28 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2011-03-28 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2011-03-28 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |