LA SCR59 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Elizabeth "Ellie" Chase Franks on being a 2022 state "Students of the Year" finalist.
Title
Commends Elizabeth "Ellie" Chase Franks on being a 2022 state "Students of the Year" finalist.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 59 ADOPT (#725) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2022-05-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-05-23 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2022-05-19 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2022-05-19 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |