LA SCR58 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Luka G. Mikaberidze of Caddo Parish on being selected as Louisiana's Elementary School Student of the Year.
Title
Commends Luka G. Mikaberidze of Caddo Parish on being selected as Louisiana's Elementary School Student of the Year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 58 ADOPT (#370) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021. |
2021-05-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2021-05-18 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2021-05-18 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |