LA SCR58 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends St. Tammany Parish Fire District No. 1 Fire Chief Larry Hess for 48 years in fire protection, upon his retirement in September 2013.
Title
Commends St. Tammany Parish Fire District No. 1 Fire Chief Larry Hess for 48 years in fire protection, upon his retirement in September 2013.
Sponsors
Sen. A.G. Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 58 ADOPT (#246) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-05-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2013-05-06 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2013-05-06 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |