LA SCR58 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on June 27.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on June 27.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests various public agencies and private associations and stakeholders to work in collaboration through the Human Trafficking of Minors Study Group to study and make recommendations to the legislature of methods which may be utilized in an effort to eliminate the human trafficking of minors in the state of Louisiana.
Title
Requests various public agencies and private associations and stakeholders to work in collaboration through the Human Trafficking of Minors Study Group to study and make recommendations to the legislature of methods which may be utilized in an effort to eliminate the human trafficking of minors in the state of Louisiana.
Sponsors
Rep. Walt Leger [D] | Sen. Willie Mount [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 58, CONCUR (#998) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 58, ADOPT (#388) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 58, ADOPT (#388) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on June 27. | |
2011-06-23 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-23 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on June 27. | |
2011-06-23 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2011-06-23 | Rules suspended. Called from the calendar. | |
2011-06-23 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2011-06-22 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2011-06-21 | Read by title, amended, concurred in. | |
2011-06-20 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/21/2011. | |
2011-06-19 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/20/2011. | |
2011-06-16 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/19/2011. | |
2011-06-15 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2011-06-14 | Reported with amendments (11-0) To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2011-06-08 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | |
2011-06-07 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2011-06-07 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 28 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |
2011-06-06 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |