LA SCR56 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requests CPRA and the Dept. of Wildlife and Fisheries to cooperate in developing projects and programs to enhance the oyster industry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests CPRA and the Dept. of Wildlife and Fisheries to cooperate in developing projects and programs to enhance the oyster industry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 56 CONCUR (#692) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - House - House Vote on SCR 56 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#619) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 56 ADOPT (#220) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-01SenateSent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2020.
2020-06-01HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2020-06-01SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2020-06-01SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-05-31SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2020-05-29HouseRead by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 102 yeas, 0 nays.
2020-05-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20.
2020-05-21HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-05-20HouseReported favorably (10-0).
2020-05-18HouseRead by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2020-05-15HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2020-05-15SenateRead by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2020-05-14SenateReported favorably.
2020-05-12SenateRules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Education.
2020-05-12SenateRules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
2020-05-11SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
2020-05-07SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback