LA SCR56 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/12/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/12/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Bria Janai Williams upon being selected for a 2017 Women of Excellence Award and a Louisiana Legislative Women's Caucus Foundation Scholarship.
Title
Commends Bria Janai Williams upon being selected for a 2017 Women of Excellence Award and a Louisiana Legislative Women's Caucus Foundation Scholarship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 56 ADOPT (#171) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/12/2017. |
2017-05-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2017-05-02 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2017-05-02 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |