LA SCR56 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes April 28, 2015, as Healthy Start Day at the Louisiana Legislature and commends the city of New Orleans, Family Road of Greater Baton Rouge, Crescent City WIC Services of Gretna, and Family Tree Information Education Counseling Center of Lafayette for contributions in improving the health of Louisiana moms and babies.
Title
Recognizes April 28, 2015, as Healthy Start Day at the Louisiana Legislature and commends the city of New Orleans, Family Road of Greater Baton Rouge, Crescent City WIC Services of Gretna, and Family Tree Information Education Counseling Center of Lafayette for contributions in improving the health of Louisiana moms and babies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 56 ADOPT (#98) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2015-04-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2015-04-28 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2015-04-27 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |