LA SCR55 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-31 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
Pending: House Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes the Congress and requests certain federal and state entities to refrain from enacting or adopting laws, rules, regulations, or guidance that restricts the ability of financial institutions from offering products or services to the fossil fuel industry
Title
Memorializes the Congress and requests certain federal and state entities to refrain from enacting or adopting laws, rules, regulations, or guidance that restricts the ability of financial institutions from offering products or services to the fossil fuel industry
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 55 ADOPT (#887) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2022-05-26 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2022-05-26 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |