LA SCR54 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 04/27.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 04/27.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates October 1, 2012, as "World Peace Day in Louisiana".
Title
Designates October 1, 2012, as "World Peace Day in Louisiana".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 54, ADOPT (#344) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 04/27. | |
2012-04-17 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-04-17 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-04-16 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | |
2012-04-11 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2012-04-11 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |
2012-04-10 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |