LA SCR52 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Bob Davis Electric Company Inc. on the occasion of its 100th anniversary.
Title
Commends Bob Davis Electric Company Inc. on the occasion of its 100th anniversary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 52 ADOPT (#642) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2022-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-05-18 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2022-05-17 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2022-05-17 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |