LA SCR5 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-13 - Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-13 - Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Suspends from July 1, 2015, through June 30, 2016, all the exclusions and exemptions against all the statewide sales taxes.
Title
Suspends from July 1, 2015, through June 30, 2016, all the exclusions and exemptions against all the statewide sales taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |