LA SCR5 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on June 27.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on June 27.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Approves the FY 2011-2012 annual plan for integrated coastal protection.
Title
Approves the FY 2011-2012 annual plan for integrated coastal protection.
Sponsors
Rep. Gordon Dove [R] | Sen. Dan Morrish [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-14 - House - House Vote on SCR 5, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#568) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 5, ADOPT (#253) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 5, ADOPT (#253) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on June 27. | |
2011-06-15 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-15 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2011-06-14 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2011-06-14 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 97 yeas, 0 nays. | |
2011-06-09 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/14/2011. | |
2011-06-09 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2011-06-08 | Reported favorably (13-0-1). | |
2011-05-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | |
2011-05-24 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2011-05-24 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | |
2011-05-23 | Reported favorably. | |
2011-04-25 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Natural Resources. |