LA SCR49 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-10)
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-10)
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Pilots for Patients for its invaluable philanthropic service of providing free air transportation for Louisiana patients to medical treatment facilities throughout the United States of America.
Title
Commends Pilots for Patients for its invaluable philanthropic service of providing free air transportation for Louisiana patients to medical treatment facilities throughout the United States of America.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 49 CO-AUTHORS (#81) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 49 ADOPT (#80) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 49 ADOPT (#80) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2015-04-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2015-04-27 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2015-04-22 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |