LA SCR49 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Board of Regents to develop a uniform policy regarding the acceptance of college credit hours earned through Advanced Placement and International Baccalaureate exams.
Title
Requests the Board of Regents to develop a uniform policy regarding the acceptance of college credit hours earned through Advanced Placement and International Baccalaureate exams.
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Nevers [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 49 CONCUR (#737) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 49 ADOPT (#338) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 49 ADOPT (#338) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013. |
2013-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2013-05-28 | House | Read by title, concurred in. |
2013-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/28/2013. |
2013-05-22 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2013-05-21 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2013-05-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-05-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |