LA SCR48 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Board of Regents to consider articulation and transfer efforts of public postsecondary educational institutions when allocating funds through the funding formula for public postsecondary education.
Title
Requests the Board of Regents to consider articulation and transfer efforts of public postsecondary educational institutions when allocating funds through the funding formula for public postsecondary education.
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Nevers [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 48 ADOPT (#337) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013. |
2013-05-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2013-05-28 | House | Read by title, concurred in. |
2013-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/28/2013. |
2013-05-22 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2013-05-21 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2013-05-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-05-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |