LA SCR47 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on June 27.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-23 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on June 27.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Task Force on the Crescent City Connection to analyze re-authorization of tolls, ferry services, and all components and management of the operation of the Crescent City Connection Division of the Department of Transportation and Development.
Title
Creates Task Force on the Crescent City Connection to analyze re-authorization of tolls, ferry services, and all components and management of the operation of the Crescent City Connection Division of the Department of Transportation and Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 47, CONCUR (#995) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - House - House Vote on SCR 47, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#887) (Y: 50 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 47, ADOPT (#324) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - House - House Vote on SCR 47, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#887) (Y: 50 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 47, ADOPT (#324) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-23 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on June 27. | |
2011-06-23 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-23 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on June 27. | |
2011-06-23 | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2011-06-22 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2011-06-21 | Read by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 50 yeas, 40 nays. | |
2011-06-20 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/21/2011. | |
2011-06-19 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/20/2011. | |
2011-06-16 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/19/2011. | |
2011-06-15 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2011-06-14 | Reported with amendments (14-0-1). | |
2011-06-06 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | |
2011-06-02 | Received in the House from the Senate. | |
2011-06-01 | Senate amendments were read and adopted. Read by title as amended and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered engrossed and sent to the House. | |
2011-05-31 | Reported with amendments. | |
2011-05-24 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |