LA SCR46 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/28/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/28/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Bill Capo for his outstanding service to the people of Louisiana and beyond.
Title
Commends Bill Capo for his outstanding service to the people of Louisiana and beyond.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 46 ADOPT (#105) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/28/2017. |
2017-04-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2017-04-25 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2017-04-25 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |