LA SCR46 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses the right of the state of Louisiana to manage its water resources.
Title
Expresses the right of the state of Louisiana to manage its water resources.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - House - House Vote on SCR 46 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#653) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 46 ADOPT (#77) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 46 CO-AUTHORS (#76) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 46 ADOPT (#77) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 46 CO-AUTHORS (#76) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015. |
2015-06-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2015-06-02 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 94 yeas, 0 nays. |
2015-05-28 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/02/2015. |
2015-05-21 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2015-05-20 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). |
2015-04-27 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2015-04-22 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |