LA SCR45 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Read by title, roll called, yeas 28, nays 55. The resolution was rejected.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Read by title, roll called, yeas 28, nays 55. The resolution was rejected.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a commission to study the feasibility of a constitutional convention and make recommendations relative thereto. (OR INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Creates a commission to study the feasibility of a constitutional convention and make recommendations relative thereto. (OR INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Carter [D] | Sen. Wesley Bishop [D] | Sen. Jean-Paul Morrell [D] | Sen. Karen Peterson [D] |
Sen. Gregory Tarver [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on SCR 45 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1399) (Y: 28 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on SCR 45 AMENDMENT # 4743 BY FOIL MOTION TO ADOPT (#1398) (Y: 39 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 45 ADOPT (#241) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House Vote on SCR 45 AMENDMENT # 4743 BY FOIL MOTION TO ADOPT (#1398) (Y: 39 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 45 ADOPT (#241) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 28, nays 55. The resolution was rejected. |
2018-05-18 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/18. |
2018-05-17 | House | Notice given. |
2018-05-17 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-15 | House | Reported with amendments (5-3). |
2018-04-04 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-04-03 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |