LA SCR44 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Risk Charge Commission to study current law and consider making recommendations regarding the costs and risks in drilling a well in a unit.
Title
Creates the Risk Charge Commission to study current law and consider making recommendations regarding the costs and risks in drilling a well in a unit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - House - House Vote on SCR 44 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#947) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 44 ADOPT (#379) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 44 ADOPT (#379) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021. |
2021-06-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/4/2021. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2021-06-03 | House | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 97 yeas, 0 nays. |
2021-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2021. |
2021-05-27 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-26 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2021-05-19 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2021-05-18 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2021-05-18 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |