LA SCR42 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates a task force to study the problem of trash and litter on state highways and waterways.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates a task force to study the problem of trash and litter on state highways and waterways.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 42 CONCUR (#1033) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - House - House Vote on SCR 42 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#978) (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 42 ADOPT (#252) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-17SenateSent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
2018-05-15HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2018-05-15SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2018-05-14SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
2018-05-11SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2018-05-11HouseRead by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 72 yeas, 0 nays.
2018-05-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/11/18.
2018-04-27HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2018-04-26HouseReported with amendments (6-0).
2018-04-18HouseRead by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-04-17HouseReported with amendments (13-0) To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2018-04-06HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2018-04-05HouseReceived in the House from the Senate.
2018-04-04SenateSenate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
2018-04-03SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2018-03-26SenateReported with amendments.
2018-03-22SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality.
2018-03-22SenateRules suspended.
2018-03-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=18rs&b=SCR42&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077997
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078985
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083001
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096494
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1078914
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082843
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087074
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087307
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090338
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090606
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095705
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095969
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1077998
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082676
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1083195
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1087311
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1090616
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1100380
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1082962
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1095744
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1096387

Bill Comments

feedback